Global Patent Index - EP 0980938 A2

EP 0980938 A2 2000-02-23 - Support assembly for buildings construction and method of making the same

Title (en)

Support assembly for buildings construction and method of making the same

Title (de)

Trägervorrichtung für Baukonstruktionen und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Trägervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Assemblage de support pour construction de bâtiments et méthode de fabrication relative

Publication

EP 0980938 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99116403 A

Priority

DE 19837883 A

Abstract (en)

The support structure, for the construction industry, is at least one grid carrier (2) with an upper (3) and lower (4) belt held together by spacers (5). The mounting and/or connection units are extended at the grid carrier and/or its design or configuration is modified and fitted to each carrier (1). The length of at least one belt is varied to give the structure a curve or kink by stretching a belt by rollers to reduce the cross-section at least at the belt sections between the connecting points (6) with the spacers.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Trägervorrichtung (1) für Baukonstruktionen, die zumindest einen Gitterträger (2) aufweist, der einen Obergurt (3) und zumindest einen Untergurt (4) sowie Ober- und Untergurt verbindende Abstandshalter (5) enthält, wobei Befestigungs- und/oder Verbindungseinrichtungen am Gitterträger ergänzt sind und/oder seine Gestalt oder seine Konfiguration verändert und an eine jeweilige Trägervorrichtung angepaßt ist. Des weiteren wird ein Verfahren zum Herstellen einer derartigen Trägervorrichtung angegeben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/065; E04C 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/40 (2006.01); E04C 5/065 (2006.01); E04C 5/16 (2006.01); E04C 5/20 (2006.01); E04H 12/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/065 (2013.01); E04C 3/40 (2013.01); E04C 5/16 (2013.01); E04C 5/163 (2013.01); E04C 5/165 (2013.01); E04C 5/166 (2013.01); E04C 5/20 (2013.01); E04H 12/2215 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817428 U1 19990512; DE 19837883 A1 20000302; DE 19837883 C2 20030320; EP 0980938 A2 20000223; EP 0980938 A3 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 5/065 A, 7E 04C 3/40 B, 7E 04C 3/08 B, 7E 04B 1/24 B, 7E 04H 1/12 B

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI