Global Patent Index - EP 0980940 A1

EP 0980940 A1 2000-02-23 - Spacer for concrete constructions reinforcements

Title (en)

Spacer for concrete constructions reinforcements

Title (de)

Abstandhalter für Bewehrungen von Betonbauelementen

Title (fr)

Espaceur d'armatures de constructions en béton

Publication

EP 0980940 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116014 A

Priority

DE 29814923 U

Abstract (en)

A foundation body (6) has a detent socket for fixing a reinforcement iron as well as a detent element (12) in which a cross iron can be fitted to run transversely to the reinforcement iron. The reinforcement iron and cross iron can be inserted in the detent socket and detent element from the same direction. A spacer (10 extends in an extension of the insert direction of the cross iron.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Aufständern zweier stabförmiger Teile, beispielsweise einer Bewehrung in einer Gießform insbesondere für Betonfertigteile, mit einem Grundkörper (6), der eine Rastaufnahme (7) zur Befestigung eines Bewehrungseisens (8) aufweist, und der mit wenigstens einem Distanzhalter (10; 11) versehen ist, wobei sie ein Rastelement (12) aufweist, in der ein im wesentlichen quer zum Bewehrungseisen (8) verlaufendes Quereisen (13) einrastbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/16 (2006.01); E04C 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/203 (2013.01); E04C 5/167 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814923 U1 20000105; EP 0980940 A1 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020301

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: LOESCH SYSTEMBAUTEILE GMBH

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI