Global Patent Index - EP 0980948 A1

EP 0980948 A1 2000-02-23 - Mounting device for a vehicle door handle

Title (en)

Mounting device for a vehicle door handle

Title (de)

Montagevorrichtung für den Türgriff einer Fahrzeugtür

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage de commande d'ouverture de porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 0980948 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402043 A

Priority

FR 9810556 A

Abstract (en)

The motor vehicle door comprises an external panel (1) receiving an exterior opening control (3) comprising manual and key opening sections. There is an edge flange (2) and a support plate carrying the connection cables (5) to the lock opening control. There is an intermediate mounting plate (4) carried by the support plate between it and the external panel.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif est destiné à une porte comportant un panneau extérieur (1) adapté pour recevoir une commande d'ouverture extérieure (3) comprenant des moyens d'ouverture manuelle et des moyens d'ouverture par clé, un chant (2), et un module comprenant une plaque support portant des éléments d'équipement comportant des éléments de liaison (5) des moyens d'ouverture à une serrure. Selon l'invention, le dispositif comprend une plaque intermédiaire de montage (4) portée par la plaque support entre celle-ci et le panneau extérieur (1), et une commande d'ouverture extérieure (3), comportant des moyens de solidarisation mutuelle (41, 32); il est également muni de moyens de solidarisation et de pré-positionnement des éléments de liaison (5). Le dispositif est destiné à optimiser le processus de montage des portes des véhicules automobiles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/04 (2006.01); E05B 1/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 53/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 79/06 (2013.01); E05B 79/20 (2013.01); Y10S 292/31 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5761 (2015.04); Y10T 70/7655 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8541 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8568 (2015.04); Y10T 70/8973 (2015.04); Y10T 292/57 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980948 A1 20000223; EP 0980948 B1 20031015; DE 69912049 D1 20031120; DE 69912049 T2 20040826; FR 2782535 A1 20000225; FR 2782535 B1 20001110; JP 2000064672 A 20000229; US 6490894 B1 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2004-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041230

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-04-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20031015

2004-01-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69912049

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-11-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYSTEMS-FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000415

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI