Global Patent Index - EP 0980950 A2

EP 0980950 A2 2000-02-23 - Hinge

Title (en)

Hinge

Title (de)

Scharnier

Title (fr)

Charniére

Publication

EP 0980950 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115704 A

Priority

AT 139998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6205617B1] A hinge with an adjusting device for adjusting the position of an elongated hinge arm which is mounted on a base plate and is connected to a hinge cup by means of articulated hinge links. The base plate has a mounting plane for abutting a furniture side wall in the mounted position and the position of the hinge arm is adjustable by the adjusting device in a plane perpendicular to said mounting plane. The adjusting device comprises two screws spaced from each other in the longitudinal direction of the hinge arm and being perpendicular to the mounting plane of the base plate. The screws are coupled to each other so that rotation of one screw will result in rotation of the other screw.

Abstract (de)

Ein Scharnier mit einer Verstelleinrichtung für einen auf einer Grundplatte (4) gelagerten Scharnierarm (5), der mittels Gelenkhebel mit einem türseitigen Scharniertopf (3) verbunden ist. Die Grundplatte (4) liegt im montierten Zustand mit einer Montagefläche an einer Möbelseitenwand (2) an. Mittels der Verstelleinrichtung ist die Position des Scharnierarmes (5) relativ zur Grundplatte (4) zur seitlichen Verstellung einer Türe (1) veränderbar. Die Verstelleinrichtung umfaßt zwei in Längsrichtung des Scharnierarmes (5) versetzte Spindeln (6, 7, 17, 18), die drehfest miteinander verbunden sind. Dadurch wird bei der seitlichen Verstellung der Türe (1) der Scharnierarm (5) exakt senkrecht zur Möbelseitenwand (2) bewegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0407 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5321 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5322 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53225 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5323 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53235 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53257 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980950 A2 20000223; EP 0980950 A3 20000503; AT 406497 B 20000525; AT A139998 A 19991015; BR 9903725 A 20000829; US 6205617 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021221

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES IT

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI