Global Patent Index - EP 0980950 A3

EP 0980950 A3 2000-05-03 - Hinge

Title (en)

Hinge

Title (de)

Scharnier

Title (fr)

Charniére

Publication

EP 0980950 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115704 A

Priority

AT 139998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6205617B1] A hinge with an adjusting device for adjusting the position of an elongated hinge arm which is mounted on a base plate and is connected to a hinge cup by means of articulated hinge links. The base plate has a mounting plane for abutting a furniture side wall in the mounted position and the position of the hinge arm is adjustable by the adjusting device in a plane perpendicular to said mounting plane. The adjusting device comprises two screws spaced from each other in the longitudinal direction of the hinge arm and being perpendicular to the mounting plane of the base plate. The screws are coupled to each other so that rotation of one screw will result in rotation of the other screw.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0407 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5321 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5322 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53225 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5323 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53235 (2013.01); Y10T 16/53257 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980950 A2 20000223; EP 0980950 A3 20000503; AT 406497 B 20000525; AT A139998 A 19991015; BR 9903725 A 20000829; US 6205617 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021221

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES IT

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI