Global Patent Index - EP 0980952 A2

EP 0980952 A2 2000-02-23 - Door- or window-frame with side-hung or swing-down pane

Title (en)

Door- or window-frame with side-hung or swing-down pane

Title (de)

Tür- oder Fensterrahmen mit seitlich oder unten angelenktem Flügel

Title (fr)

Châssis de porte ou de fenêtre à battant articulé latéral ou en bas

Publication

EP 0980952 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99115047 A

Priority

IT BO980500 A

Abstract (en)

A door- or window-frame composed of a framework (1) and a pane (2) which is hinged to the framework by means of hinges which can be actuated by means of a handle-like actuation element (36) which is adapted to assume three positions for presetting the hinges so as to select the closure of the pane or side-hung opening or swing-down opening; the door- or window-frame further comprises at least two hinges (11,12) which comprise a hinge pin (13) which is fixed to the hinging jamb (3) of the framework (1) and a tubular cap (16,17) which can be fixed to the hinging upright of the pane and in which the hinge pin (13) is rotatably supported, an arm (20) being rigidly coupled to the tubular cap (16,17) of the lower hinge and supporting means for the swing-down articulation of the pane, engagement means (38) being provided in the pane, being controlled by the actuation element (36) and being adapted to rigidly engage the tubular cap (16,17) of the upper hinge with the pane, to lock the arm (20) in the side-hung opening position and to release the tubular caps in the swing-down position, means being further provided for limiting the opening of the pane in the swing-down position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/52 (2006.01); E05D 15/522 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/5202 (2013.01); E05D 15/522 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980952 A2 20000223; EP 0980952 A3 20010627; IT 1304481 B1 20010319; IT BO980500 A1 20000221

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011228

2002-04-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI