Global patent index - EP 0980955 A3

EP 0980955 A3 2000-10-25 - One-piece connector for a T-shape connection between two section members

Title (en)

One-piece connector for a T-shape connection between two section members

Title (de)

Einstückiger Verbinder einer T-Verbindung zweier Profilstäbe

Title (fr)

Raccord monobloc pour un assemblage en forme de T entre deux profilés

Publication

EP 0980955 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99114040 A

Priority

DE 29814825 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0980955A2] The connector (10) is fitted with its entire volume in the hollow space (13) of the first section rod (11). The recess (16) which receives the connecting end (15') of the connection device (15), is open sideways transverse to the first section rod.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/964; E06B 3/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/964 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9642 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814825 U1 19991223; EP 0980955 A2 20000223; EP 0980955 A3 20001025

INPADOC legal status

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 06B 3/964 A, 7E 06B 3/96 B

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI