Global Patent Index - EP 0980958 A2

EP 0980958 A2 2000-02-23 - Measuring device for determining the alignment and the trajectory of a drill string

Title (en)

Measuring device for determining the alignment and the trajectory of a drill string

Title (de)

Messvorrichtung zum Bestimmen der Ausrichtung und des Verlaufs eines Bohrgestänges

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mesure pour déterminer l'alignement et la trajectoire d'une tige de forage

Publication

EP 0980958 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115943 A

Priority

DE 19837546 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has several inclinometer sensors (6) distributed over the length of the drill rod (4) and arranged at defined points on the drill rod, an evaluation unit for the measurement data acquired by the inclinometer sensors and an arrangement for transferring the measurement data to the evaluation unit.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Meßvorrichtung vorgeschlagen, mit der sich die Ausrichtung und der Verlauf eines Bohrgestänges (4) auch während der Bohrmaßnahme, d.h. ohne Demontage des Bohrgestänges, bestimmen lassen. Erfindungsgemäß umfaßt die Meßvorrichtung mehrere Inklinometersensoren (6), die über die Länge des Bohrgestänges (4) verteilt, an definierten Positionen des Bohrgestänges (4) angeordnet sind, eine Auswerteeinheit für die von den Inklinometersensoren (6) erfaßten Meßdaten und Mittel zum Übertragen der Meßdaten zu der Auswerteeinheit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/022; E02D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/022 (2012.01); E02D 1/00 (2006.01); E02D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/022 (2013.01); E02D 1/00 (2013.01); E02D 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980958 A2 20000223; EP 0980958 A3 20010214; DE 19837546 A1 20000302; DE 19837546 C2 20010726

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI