Global Patent Index - EP 0980958 A3

EP 0980958 A3 2001-02-14 - Measuring device for determining the alignment and the trajectory of a drill string

Title (en)

Measuring device for determining the alignment and the trajectory of a drill string

Title (de)

Messvorrichtung zum Bestimmen der Ausrichtung und des Verlaufs eines Bohrgestänges

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mesure pour déterminer l'alignement et la trajectoire d'une tige de forage

Publication

EP 0980958 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115943 A

Priority

DE 19837546 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0980958A2] The arrangement has several inclinometer sensors (6) distributed over the length of the drill rod (4) and arranged at defined points on the drill rod, an evaluation unit for the measurement data acquired by the inclinometer sensors and an arrangement for transferring the measurement data to the evaluation unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 47/022; E02D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/022 (2012.01); E02D 1/00 (2006.01); E02D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 47/022 (2013.01); E02D 1/00 (2013.01); E02D 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980958 A2 20000223; EP 0980958 A3 20010214; DE 19837546 A1 20000302; DE 19837546 C2 20010726

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI