Global patent index - EP 0980966 A1

EP 0980966 A1 2000-02-23 - Exhaust system with reservoir for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Exhaust system with reservoir for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Abgasanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Speichervolumen

Title (fr)

Système d'échappement avec accumulateur pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0980966 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115344 A

Priority

  • DE 19837507 A
  • DE 19837509 A

Abstract (en)

The engine (1) has an exhaust gas cleaner/catalytic converter (3,5) and a storage volume for part of the exhaust flow after starting the engine. The vacuum in the storage volume (8) is maintained by a shut-off valve (10) when the engine is stopped. An under pressure pump (18) to evacuate the storage volume is connected to it with its intake side. The feed side of the pump is connected to intake unit (11) of the engine, and/or to the exhaust pipe (4') upstream of the exhaust gas cleaner/main catalytic converter (5).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Abgasanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine (1) mit einer Abgasreinigungsvorrichtung (3, 5) sowie mit einem evakuierbaren Speichervolumen (8), in das insbesondere nach einem Start der Brennkraftmaschine für eine gewissen Zeitspanne zumindest ein Teil des Brennkraftmaschinen-Abgasstromes einleitbar ist. Erfindungsgemäß ist neben einem bei stillstehender Brennkraftmaschine das Vakuum im Speichervolumen haltenden Sperrventil (10) eine Unterdruckpumpe (18) zur Evakuierung des Speichervolumens vorgesehen. Dabei kann neben einer in der Abgasanlage stromab der Abgasreinigungsvorrichtung vorgesehenen Sperrklappe (6) in einer den Brennkraftmaschinen-Abgasstrom zum Speichervolumen führenden Zweigleitung (7) ein Regelventil (9) zur dosierten Befüllung des Speichervolumens vorgesehen sein. Ferner kann die Abgasanlage bereichsweise doppelwandig ausgeführt, sein, so daß zwei im wesentlichen koaxial zueinander verlaufende Abgasleitungen vorliegen, wobei über die erste, vorzugsweise innere Abgasleitung das Abgas von der Brennkraftmaschine weggeführt und über die zweite, vorzugsweise äußere Abgasleitung zum Speichervolumen hingeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/18; F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/18 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F02D 9/04 (2006.01); F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/04 (2013.01); F01N 3/18 (2013.01); F01N 3/20 (2013.01); F02M 26/15 (2016.02); F02M 26/34 (2016.02); F02M 26/37 (2016.02); F02M 26/71 (2016.02); F01N 2240/26 (2013.01); F02M 26/42 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980966 A1 20000223; EP 0980966 B1 20020508; US 6250073 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-08-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-08-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020925

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901383

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-13

2002-06-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020509

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010724

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI