Global Patent Index - EP 0980972 A2

EP 0980972 A2 2000-02-23 - Apparatus and method for controlling fuel injection in internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for controlling fuel injection in internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzsteuervorrichtung und -Verfahren für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode de commande d'injection de carburant pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0980972 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99110286 A

Priority

JP 23321998 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus and a method for controlling fuel injection in an internal combustion engine (1) for preventing torsional vibrations of the engine without deteriorating the acceleration performance is disclosed. The apparatus is provided with a control unit (an ECU) (30) for controlling a fuel injection quantity for the diesel engine (1) of a vehicle (10). The ECU (30) calculates the change rate DELTA NE of engine revolutions in accordance with an input from a crank angle sensor (35) and subtracts a value obtained by smoothing a variation component of DELTA NE from the DELTA NE so as to extract a torsional vibration component thereof. Moreover, the ECU (30) corrects the fuel injection quantity of the engine to reduce the torsional vibration component. Since the extracted torsional vibration component does not contain steady change in the revolutions during acceleration or the like, the steady change in the revolutions caused only by the acceleration is not affected by the correction of the fuel injection quantity. Therefore, deterioration in the acceleration performance caused by prevention of the torsional vibrations can be prevented. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02D 41/10; F02D 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1498 (2013.01); F02D 41/10 (2013.01); F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1015 (2013.01); F02D 2250/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980972 A2 20000223; EP 0980972 A3 20010516; EP 0980972 B1 20070328; DE 69935639 D1 20070510; DE 69935639 T2 20071213; JP 2000064880 A 20000229; JP 3367429 B2 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100527

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100527

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100527

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090515

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69935639 P 20070510

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-03-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040318

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990527

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI