Global Patent Index - EP 0980977 A3

EP 0980977 A3 2000-10-11 - Piston for a piston compressor

Title (en)

Piston for a piston compressor

Title (de)

Kolben für einen Kolbenverdichter

Title (fr)

Piston pour un compresseur à piston

Publication

EP 0980977 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99116360 A

Priority

DE 29814962 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0980977A2] There is a reciprocating connecting-rod (14) inside a cylinder (12), with the connecting-rod being connected to a piston (10). The piston has a valve washer (16) with at least one through-let (18) for to-be-sucked gaseous medium, on the piston's underside, and a ring-shaped piston head (20) made from plastics. The piston head may have a sealed support ring (22) on its ring inner side that is made from metal or a metal alloy. The coefficient of friction of both the support ring material and the cylinder material are approximately the same. The support ring may be made from brass and may have a tapered-off bevel (24,26). The valve washer may extend through a central ring opening of the piston head, e.g. the support ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/0016 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0475 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814962 U1 19991104; EP 0980977 A2 20000223; EP 0980977 A3 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030214

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: THURNER, HELMUT

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI