Global patent index - EP 0981010 A1

EP 0981010 A1 2000-02-23 - Reflector for a luminaire, in particular for street lighting

Title (en)

Reflector for a luminaire, in particular for street lighting

Title (de)

Reflektor für eine Leuchte, insbesondere für Strassenbeleuchtung

Title (fr)

Réflecteur de luminaire d'éclairage notamment pour voie publique

Publication

EP 0981010 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401990 A

Priority

FR 9810535 A

Abstract (en)

The originally flat stamping, from a, typically, less than 1mm thick, highly reflective sheet, has an area (10) cut away to accommodate the base of the lamp (6). Generally triangular cutaways are provided, (20) on either side of this and, (18) in two corresponding positions at the other end. These cutaways produce an end tongue (16), between the second pair, and two side wings (22). In each side wing, smaller complementary triangular cutaways are nade, (28) in the peripheral areas and, (30) parallel to the lantern axis (SS). The apex of each cutaway excision ends in a circular hole (18a, 20a, 28a, 30a) for stress relief. The stamping acquires the required complex concave form in a suitably tooled press, the side areas (26) adjoining the lamp base remaining flat. The edges of the cutaway zones then closely coincide, providing a nearly continuous reflecting surface. The reflector is secured to the supporting lantern case through a central screw-hole (32), and its shape is maintained by contour ribs moulded transversely in the case. For fine adjustment of the reflector's optical characteristics, small plastic shims can be clipped over the ribs where necessary.

Abstract (fr)

Le réflecteur (2) de luminaire d'éclairage de voie publique présente un espace concave (4) entre un sommet (12) et un bord de périmètre inférieur (14), le réflecteur ayant des première et deuxième extrémités (8, 10) et permettant de recouvrir une source lumineuse (6) par des surfaces optiques bombées (16, 22) situées de part et d'autre d'un plan de symétrie (S), les surfaces optiques convergeant vers la première extrémité du réflecteur. Il est constitué d'une feuille pliée (100) présentant, au niveau d'au moins une partie des surfaces optiques, des éléments de surface ayant des courbures selon deux plans perpendiculaires. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/10 (2013.01); Y02B 20/72 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981010 A1 20000223; FR 2782551 A1 20000225; FR 2782551 B1 20001110

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040810

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI