Global Patent Index - EP 0981016 A1

EP 0981016 A1 2000-02-23 - Burner for operating a combustion chamber

Title (en)

Burner for operating a combustion chamber

Title (de)

Brenner zum Betrieb einer Brennkammer

Title (fr)

Brûleur pour le fonctionnement d'une chambre de combustion

Publication

EP 0981016 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810805 A

Priority

EP 98810805 A

Abstract (en)

A fuel injection device (7) is provided in the direction of the air inlet current (6) in front of the tangential air inlet slits (1) to inject the fuel in a parallel flow direction to the air inlet current into the air inlet slit. The injection device injects the fuel isokinetically relative to the combustion inlet air. The individual injection devices for each air inlet slit are connected together through a cohesive frame formed as a module fixable on the burner.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Brenner zum Betrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine, einer Brennkammer einer Gasturbogruppe oder Feuerungsanlage, mit wenigstens zwei halben, hohlen Teilkegelkörpern (2,3), die derart ineinander gefügt sind, daß deren Längssymmetrieachsen zueinander radial versetzt verlaufen und die mindestens zwei tangentiale Lufteintrittsschlitze (1) für einen Verbrennungszuluftstrom (6) sowie einen Kegelhohlraum einschließen, und einer Düsenanordnung zum Eindüsen flüssigen, hochreaktiven Brennstoffes in den Kegelhohlraum, die im Bereich des engsten Innendurchmessers des Kegelhohlraumes angeordnet ist. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß in Richtung des Verbrennungszuluftstromes vor den tangentialen Lufteintrittsschlitzen jeweils eine Eindüsungsvorrichtung (7) für Brennstoff vorgesehen ist, die den Brennstoff in paralleler Strömungsrichtung zum Verbrennungszuluftstrom in die Lufteintrittsschlitze eindüst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00; F23D 14/64; F23D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 14/64 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/002 (2013.01); F23D 14/64 (2013.01); F23D 17/00 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0321809 A1 19890628 - BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981016 A1 20000223; EP 0981016 B1 20040107; CN 1113187 C 20030702; CN 1245276 A 20000223; DE 59810551 D1 20040212; US 6263676 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20161110

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59810551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59810551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2012-10-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20120918

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59810551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59810551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59810551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59810551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810551

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BURNER FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTION CHAMBER

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI