Global patent index - EP 0981021 A1

EP 0981021 A1 2000-02-23 - Grate for incinerators

Title (en)

Grate for incinerators

Title (de)

Rost für Verbrennungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Grille pour incinérateurs

Publication

EP 0981021 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810804 A

Priority

EP 98810804 A

Abstract (en)

The movable grate lining units (5) are provided with a drive (9), which has a torsion shaft (11). The movable grate lining supports (7) are connected via a torsion lever (12) with the torsion shaft and thus have a common rotary point with the shaft. The grate lining units have a circular segment shape. The non-linear movement of the movable grate lining units resulting from the drive mechanism is compensated.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Rost für Verbrennungsanlagen zur Verbrennung von Brenngut (1), insbesondere Müll, bestehend aus mindestens einer Rostbahn, die sich aus in Fliessrichtung des Brenngutes (1) abwechselnd angeordneten ortsfesten und beweglichen, eine Anzahl nebeneinanderliegender Rostbelageinheiten (4,5) aufweisender Rostbelagreihen (2,3) zusammensetzt, wobei die Rostbelageinheiten (4, 5) im Bereich ihres Hinterendes mit feststehenden bzw. beweglichen Rostbelagträgern (6, 7) verbunden sind und sich mit ihrem Vorderende auf oder über der nachfolgenden Rostbelageinheit (4,5) bewegen, und den beweglichen Rostbelageinheiten (5) ein Antrieb (9 zugeordnet ist, der eine aus dem Unterwindbereich (8) herausgeführte Torsionswelle (11) aufweist. Der Rost ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, dass die beweglichen Rostbelagträger (7) über einen Torsionshebel (12) fest mit der Torsionswelle (11) verbunden sind und somit einen gemeinsamen Drehpunkt mit der dazugehörenden Torsionswelle (11) aufweisen, und dass die Rostbelageinheiten (4, 5) als Kreissegmenfform derart ausgebildet sind, dass die aus der Antriebsmechanik resultierende nichtlineare Bewegung der beweglichen Rostbelageinheiten (5) kompensiert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23H 7/08 (2006.01); F23G 5/00 (2006.01); F23H 3/02 (2006.01); F23H 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981021 A1 20000223; JP 2000065332 A 20000303; KR 20000017377 A 20000325; NO 993958 A 20000221; NO 993958 D0 19990817; TW 409173 B 20001021; US 6332410 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI