Global Patent Index - EP 0981028 A1

EP 0981028 A1 2000-02-23 - Process and device for cleaning of exhaust air of kitchen apparatus

Title (en)

Process and device for cleaning of exhaust air of kitchen apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Abluft aus Küchengeräten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de nettoyage d'air sortant d'un appareil de cuisine

Publication

EP 0981028 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115452 A

Priority

EP 98115452 A

Abstract (en)

The exhaust air is subjected to an increase in pressure for condensing and then introduced into a fluidized bath (13), preferably via a filter (17) such as a sintered metal filter. Fresh liquid is supplied continuously or discontinuously to the fluidized bath and fluid is discharged from the bath. The energy introduced into the bath through the exhaust air can be drawn off at least in part.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Reinigen von Abluft aus Küchengeräten, wie Dämpfern, Grillgeräten, Backöfen und dergleichen. Gemäß diesem Verfahren wird die Abluft einer Druckerhöhung unterworfen und anschließend in ein Flüssigkeitsbad eingeleitet. Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft auch eine Vorrichtung (1) zum Reinigen von Abluft aus Küchengeräten, die eine Abluftleitung (3) zum Ausbringen der Abluft aus dem Küchengerät, eine Druckerhöhungseinrichtung (7) zum Erhöhen des Druckes in der Abluft ein Flüssigkeitsbad (13) und eine Zuführleitung (9) zum Zuführen der Abluft in das Flüssigkeitsbad (13) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2013.01); Y10S 55/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981028 A1 20000223; EP 0981028 B1 20030423; DE 59808073 D1 20030528; US 6238463 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150831

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-12 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: MKN MASCHINENFABRIK KURT NEUBAUER GMBH & CO., DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20150511

2015-06-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MKN MASCHINENFABRIK KURT NEUBAUER GMBH & CO., DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20150511

2015-01-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MKN MASCHLNENFABRIK KURT NEUBAUER GMBH & CO. K, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59808073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141210

2015-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KROHER - STROBEL RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20141023

2015-01-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KROHER - STROBEL RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20121016

2014-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KROHER - STROBEL RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE

2012-10-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-10-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VON LIERES BRACHMANN SCHULZE PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-10-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59808073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KROHER - STROBEL RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE PA, DE

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808073

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI