Global Patent Index - EP 0981029 A2

EP 0981029 A2 2000-02-23 - Monting assembly

Title (en)

Monting assembly

Title (de)

Montageanordnung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de montage

Publication

EP 0981029 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306512 A

Priority

  • GB 9818066 A
  • GB 9901966 A

Abstract (en)

A mounting assembly (10) for mounting a radiator (12) on a wall (14), the assembly (10) comprising of a first part (16) mountable on the wall (14) and a second part (22) engageable with the radiator (12), the second part (22) being movable between a first position for holding the radiator (12) on the wall (14), and a second position clear of the radiator (12) such that the radiator (12) is movable away from the wall (14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0293 (2013.01); F24D 19/02 (2013.01); F24D 19/0209 (2013.01); F24D 19/0226 (2013.01); F24D 19/023 (2013.01); F24D 19/0233 (2013.01); F24D 19/0283 (2013.01); F24D 19/0286 (2013.01); F24D 2220/2054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB IE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981029 A2 20000223; EP 0981029 A3 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030103

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-01-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: GB IE

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-05-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MOUNTING ASSEMBLY

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): GB IE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI