Global patent index - EP 0981118 A2

EP 0981118 A2 2000-02-23 - Computer method and system for playing a game and managing wager accounts

Title (en)

Computer method and system for playing a game and managing wager accounts

Title (de)

Rechnergestützes Verfahren und System zum Spielen und zur Verwaltung von Spielkonten

Title (fr)

Méthode et système d'ordinateur pour jouer et gérer des comptes de jeu

Publication

EP 0981118 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306454 A

Priority

US 13682498 A

Abstract (en)

A computerized method and system for dealing cards and managing wager accounts is described. The system manages a player account and a carry-over account by debiting and crediting the accounts for the amounts of wagers and winnings respectively. The system accepts and commits a player ante, which the system duplicates as a fourth and a fifth card wager before dealing the first three cards to the player. After the player receives the first three cards, he or she may indicate to the system their election to play or pass the fourth card wager. The system commits the fourth card wager upon election of the play option. The system carries the fourth card wager over to a next hand, upon election of the pass option. Following the player election, the system deals a fourth card and provides the player with a similar play or pass option for the fifth card wager. The system requires play of either the fourth or fifth card wagers to commit the respective wager. Wagers that are not played are not committed and are carried-over to the next hand. Only a committed wager can win. The system also provides the player with an option to place two proposition wagers. One proposition wager is on a single hand, the other proposition wager is on a list of predetermined hands with different odds for each hand. The system does not carry over proposition wagers. Wagers that are carried over from one hand to the next are credited to the carry-over account and are available for other wagers in subsequent hands, but are not available for direct withdrawal by the player. All winnings are credited to the player account. The balance in the player account is available for direct withdrawal by the player. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01); A63F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3293 (2013.01); A63F 3/00157 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981118 A2 20000223; EP 0981118 A3 20010516

INPADOC legal status

2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI