Global Patent Index - EP 0981125 A1

EP 0981125 A1 2000-02-23 - Electronic train direction display

Title (en)

Electronic train direction display

Title (de)

Elektronische Zuglaufanzeige

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'affichage de la direction d'un train

Publication

EP 0981125 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250199 A

Priority

DE 29815264 U

Abstract (en)

The display consists of a display and control unit with a computer unit. The display and control unit is based on a thin film transistor display (1) and is inserted into a stable, flat construction housing (2) which can be securely attached to a wall. The depth of the housing is not greater than 25 mm.

Abstract (de)

Eine elektronische Zuglaufanzeige für insbesondere einen umzurüstenden Einstiegsbereich eines Reisezugwagens, besteht aus einer Anzeige- und Bedieneinheit sowie einer Rechnereinheit. Erfindungsgemäß ist hierbei ein TFT-Display (1) in ein <25 mm flaches, stabiles Aufbau gehäuse (2) eingesetzt, das entnahmesicher auf eine Wand geschraubt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 9/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 49/00 (2006.01); G09F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/08 (2013.01); B61D 49/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815264 U1 19990923; DE 59913278 D1 20060518; EP 0981125 A1 20000223; EP 0981125 B1 20060329

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100620

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100619

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100619

2011-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-24 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20090215

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2008-07-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FUNKWERK INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES KARLSFELD GMBH

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-02-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE BAHN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20061229

2006-07-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060710

2006-07-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913278 P 20060518

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2006-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060329

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOSSLOH INFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES KARLSFELD GMBH

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI