Global Patent Index - EP 0981126 A1

EP 0981126 A1 2000-02-23 - Device to tension flexible flat information supports

Title (en)

Device to tension flexible flat information supports

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufspannen flexibler, flächiger Informationsträger

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour tendre un support flexible et plat d'informations

Publication

EP 0981126 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115115 A

Priority

DE 29814739 U

Abstract (en)

Two spaced apart guide strips (10) have back-tapered guide grooves (28,30) facing each other. Spaced apart shackles (42,44) on opposite facing side edges (34,36) of the information-carrier (32) are threaded into the guide grooves. Pulleys in the form of cables (56,58,60) pull the flexible information-carrier into the space between the guide strips. The edges of the information-carrier are guided by the shackles in the guide grooves on the guide strips. A cross-bar (14) extends between the guide strips. The cable-pull is joined at one end to a transverse edge (38) of the information-carrier running crosswise to the side edges (34,36) and is guided over rollers (62,64,66,68) mounted on the cross-bar.

Abstract (de)

Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, eine Vorrichtung zum Aufspannen flexibler, flächiger Informationsträger so auszubilden, daß Informationsträger mit geringem Aufwand gewechselt werden können. Das wird erreicht durch ein Paar im Abstand voneinander angeordneter Führungsleisten (10), die einander zugewandte, hinterschnittene Führungsnuten (28,30) aufweisen, Schäkel (42,44), die im Abstand voneinander an gegenüberliegenden Seitenkanten des aufzuhängenden Informationsträgers (32) angebracht und in die Führungsnuten (28,30) einfädelbar sind und Zugmittel (56,58,60) zum Einziehen des flexiblen Informationsträgers (32) in den Raum zwischen den Führungsleisten (10,12), wobei die Ränder des Informationsträgers (32) durch die Schäkel (42,44) in den Führungsnuten (28,30) an den Führungsleisten (10,12) geführt sind.Der Informationsträger wird zwischen den Führungsleisten geführt und wie ein Segel hochgezogen. Die Schäkel an dem Informationsträger werden wie ein Segel oder eine Gardine in die hinterschnittenen Führungsnuten eingefädelt. Damit ist der Informationsträger mit den Seitenkanten zwischen den Führungsleisten verschiebbar gehalten. Der Informationsträger kann dann durch geeignete Zugmittel auseinander und in den Raum zwischen den Führungsleisten hineingezogen werden. Dazu brauchen nur die unteren Enden der Führungsleisten zugänglich zu sein. Diese sind in vielen Fällen, z.B. bei Kinoplakaten, mit einer einfachen Leiter zu erreichen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 15/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814739 U1 19981203; EP 0981126 A1 20000223; PL 334911 A1 20000131

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020807

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020426

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI