Global Patent Index - EP 0981140 A1

EP 0981140 A1 2000-02-23 - Immersed transformer self-protected by a device comprising a circuit breaker and fuses

Title (en)

Immersed transformer self-protected by a device comprising a circuit breaker and fuses

Title (de)

Eingetauchter Transformator selbsttätig geschützt durch eine Anordnung mit Lastschalter und Schmelzsicherungen

Title (fr)

Transformateur immerge auto-protege par un dispositif incluant un disjoncteur et des fusibles

Publication

EP 0981140 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410089 A

Priority

FR 9810519 A

Abstract (en)

The triphase transformer (1) is immersed in a tub (4) with dielectric gas (5). An isolating cross section (7) holds fuses (11) in place (12). The fuses are series connected for each circuit transformer between the windings and isolating section. Each pole has contact units connected to a circuit breaker (15).

Abstract (fr)

Le transformateur électrique 1 comporte une cuve 4 contenant un diélectrique liquide ou gazeux 5, et dans laquelle sont immergés : un circuit primaire et un circuit secondaire, et un dispositif de protection relié au circuit primaire et comportant un disjoncteur 15 commandé par des moyens de déclenchement et un ou plusieurs fusibles 11. Les fusibles sont disposé entre une traversée 6 de la cuve et le disjoncteur 15. Les fusibles 11, le disjoncteur 15 et les moyens de déclenchement sont associés de telle manière que dans des conditions correspondant à un court-circuit aux bornes du circuit secondaire, les organes de contact du disjoncteur se séparent et interrompent le courant sans que ne débute une fusion du fusible, et qu'il existe une valeur seuil d'intensité du courant traversant le fusible, inférieure au pouvoir de coupure du pôle correspondant du disjoncteur et au delà de laquelle la fusion du fusible est achevée avant qu'un ordre de séparation des organes de contact donné par les moyens de déclenchement ait pu entraîner la séparation des contacts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/40; H01H 71/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/40 (2006.01); H01H 71/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/1081 (2013.01); H01F 27/402 (2013.01); H01H 2085/0291 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB GR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981140 A1 20000223; EP 0981140 B1 20040128; AR 021200 A1 20020703; AU 4444799 A 20000309; AU 753147 B2 20021010; BR 9903587 A 20000829; CN 1206670 C 20050615; CN 1245342 A 20000223; DE 69914420 D1 20040304; DE 69914420 T2 20041202; EA 002377 B1 20020425; EA 199900657 A2 20000228; EA 199900657 A3 20000424; ES 2213999 T3 20040901; FR 2782409 A1 20000218; FR 2782409 B1 20021129; ID 23712 A 20000511; NO 320723 B1 20060123; NO 993766 A 20000215; NO 993766 D0 19990803

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130726

2014-05-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69914420

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130727

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-03-01 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69914420

- Effective date: 20111228

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2009-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213999 T3

2004-05-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401183

2004-05-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914420 P 20040304

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB GR IT SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB GR IT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB GR IT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI