Global Patent Index - EP 0981141 A1

EP 0981141 A1 2000-02-23 - High-voltage transformer

Title (en)

High-voltage transformer

Title (de)

Hochspannungstransformator

Title (fr)

Transformateur haute tension

Publication

EP 0981141 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99302411 A

Priority

KR 19980033701 A

Abstract (en)

A high-voltage transformer comprises an E-shaped core (100) and an I-shaped core. A high-voltage secondary winding (310) is located around the root of the central arm (111) of the E-shaped core (100). A low-voltage secondary winding (320) is also located around the central arm (111) and is separated from the high-voltage secondary winding (310) by magnetic shunts. The primary winding (300) is wound around the free end of the central arm (111) adjacent to the second secondary winding (320). This arrangement has been found to reduce radiated noise when used to drive the magnetron of a microwave oven. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 27/33 (2006.01); H01F 30/00 (2006.01); H01F 38/08 (2006.01); H01F 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0807942 A1 19971119 - SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 038 (E - 580) 4 February 1988 (1988-02-04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981141 A1 20000223; CN 1245962 A 20000301; JP 2000068133 A 20000303; KR 20000014333 A 20000306

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI