Global patent index - EP 0981145 A3

EP 0981145 A3 2001-03-07 - Multiple function rocker switch

Title (en)

Multiple function rocker switch

Title (de)

Mehrfunktionskippschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à bascule à fonctions multiples

Publication

EP 0981145 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112196 A

Priority

DE 19837895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0981145A2] The switch has a tiltable actuation element (1) with two pressure feet (2,3) on the sides on opposite sides of the tilt axis and that alternately engage a plate (7) spanning two pressure switches (5,6) when the element is tilted. A force of one intensity applied to one side of the element activates the switch on that side; a force of a second, greater intensity actuates the second switch. A third switch (10) associated with one of the two sides of the actuating element is actuated when a force of a second intensity is applied to that side of the element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981145 A2 20000223; EP 0981145 A3 20010307; DE 19837895 A1 20000224

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060321

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI