Global Patent Index - EP 0981266 A2

EP 0981266 A2 2000-02-23 - Microwave oven, its management of the starting current

Title (en)

Microwave oven, its management of the starting current

Title (de)

Mikrowellenherd : das Betrieb des Anzugsstroms

Title (fr)

Dans un four à micro-ondes, le mode de gestion du courant d'initialisation

Publication

EP 0981266 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99302885 A

Priority

KR 19980033739 A

Abstract (en)

In a microwave oven, initial surge current protection is provided by the winding of a motor (12) rather than the more conventional current-limiting resistor. Consequently, energy, that would otherwise be wasted producing unwanted heat, is used for useful work. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/68 (2006.01); H05B 6/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/666 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0981266 A2 20000223; EP 0981266 A3 20000531; EP 0981266 B1 20030709; DE 69909384 D1 20030814; DE 69909384 T2 20040609; KR 100271360 B1 20001101; KR 20000014347 A 20000306

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150414

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2016-01-06 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150414

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69909384

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909384 P 20030814

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI