Global Patent Index - EP 0981291 A2

EP 0981291 A2 2000-03-01 - METHOD AND METERING DEVICE FOR OPERATING A HOUSEHOLD DISHWASHER

Title (en)

METHOD AND METERING DEVICE FOR OPERATING A HOUSEHOLD DISHWASHER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND DOSIERVORRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINER HAUSHALTS-GESCHIRRSPÜLMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN LAVE-VAISSELLE DOMESTIQUE

Publication

EP 0981291 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98934744 A

Priority

  • DE 9801371 W
  • DE 19720820 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19720820A1] The invention relates to a method for operating a household dishwasher, said dishwasher being equipped with a programme selection device and a combined device for adding a detergent and a clear rinse agent to the washing area. The aim of the invention is to improve the cleaning effect. To this end, the clear rinse agent is added not only once during the last wash cycle, but on several occasions at various times during the wash programme. Each of these processes is characterised by an adjustable number of equal quantities or a non-adjustable number of variable quantities of a clear rinse agent. A metering device for carrying out the inventive method comprises a reservoir (1), a temporary storage unit (3) and a metering chamber (6). Both the temporary storage unit (3) and the metering chamber (6) can be configured with an adjustable volume.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/00 (2006.01); A47L 15/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4418 (2013.01); A47L 15/0055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851205A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19720820 A1 19981119; EP 0981291 A2 20000301; EP 0981291 B1 20010822; US 6338351 B1 20020115; WO 9851205 A2 19981119; WO 9851205 A3 19990204

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070516

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2006-06-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-08-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-11-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AWECO APPLIANCE SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801259

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-09-27

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-08-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METERING DEVICE FOR A HOUSEHOLD DISHWASHER

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT