Global Patent Index - EP 0981337 A2

EP 0981337 A2 2000-03-01 - USE OF PERMANENTLY CHARGED DERIVATIVES OF STEROID HORMONES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH PATHOLOGICAL ANGIOGENESIS

Title (en)

USE OF PERMANENTLY CHARGED DERIVATIVES OF STEROID HORMONES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH PATHOLOGICAL ANGIOGENESIS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON PERMANENT GELADENEN STEROIDHORMONDERIVATEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KRANKHEITEN VERBUNDEN MIT PATHOLOGISCHER ANGIOGENESE

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE DERIVES D'HORMONES STEROIDIENNES A CHARGE CONSTANTE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES ASSOCIEES A L'ANGIOGENESE PATHOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 0981337 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98903921 A

Priority

  • IL 12018497 A
  • US 9802176 W
  • US 83307497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9834583A2] The present invention discloses the use of permanently charged steroid agonists or antagonists as potent anti-angiogenic compositions comprising as an active ingredient a compound of general formulae (I, II or III), wherein DRUG is any steroid agonist or antagonist, a mixed agonist-antagonist, or a partial agonist and the substituents are as defined in the specification.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/138; A61K 31/135; A61P 7/00; A61P 15/00; A61P 17/06; A61P 19/02; A61P 27/02; A61P 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 5/32 (2006.01); A61K 31/14 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/08 (2006.01); A61P 17/00 (2006.01); A61P 17/06 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9834583 A2 19980813; WO 9834583 A3 19981105; AU 6056298 A 19980826; AU 746007 B2 20020411; CA 2280181 A1 19980813; EP 0981337 A2 20000301; EP 0981337 A4 20030312; JP 2001511182 A 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-07-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMOS CORPORATION

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/138 A

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/135 B

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 7/00 B

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 15/00 B

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 19/02 B

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 27/02 B

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 17/06 B

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 43/00 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/40 A

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 5/32 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 7/00 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 15/00 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 19/02 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 27/02 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 29/00 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/04 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 17/06 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/00 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/138 B

2005-03-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/135 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/40 A

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 5/32 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 7/00 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 15/00 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 19/02 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 27/02 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 29/00 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/04 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 17/06 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/00 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/138 B

2005-02-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/135 B

2005-02-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: USE OF PERMANENTLY CHARGED DERIVATIVES OF STEROID HORMONES FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH PATHOLOGICAL ANG

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-03-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/40 A

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 5/32 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 7/00 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 15/00 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 19/02 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 27/02 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 29/00 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 35/04 B

2003-03-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 17/06 B

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990909

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE