Global patent index - EP 0981371 A1

EP 0981371 A1 2000-03-01 - GREEN PORPHYRINS AS IMMUNOMODULATORS

Title (en)

GREEN PORPHYRINS AS IMMUNOMODULATORS

Title (de)

GRÜNE PORPHYRINE WIE IMMUNOMODULATOR

Title (fr)

PORPHYRINES VERTES UTILISEES COMME IMMUNOMODULATEURS

Publication

EP 0981371 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98921309 A

Priority

  • CA 9800484 W
  • US 85692197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852608A1] Green porphyrins act as antigen-specific immunomodulators in the active phase of an immune response to a particular antigen. This effect occurs at ambient light levels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 487/22 (2006.01); A61K 9/127 (2006.01); A61K 41/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/02 (2006.01); C08F 132/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 132/08 (2013.01); A61K 41/0071 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852608A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852608 A1 19981126; AU 7422098 A 19981211; CA 2289441 A1 19981126; CN 1149101 C 20040512; CN 1255863 A 20000607; EP 0981371 A1 20000301; JP 2000516964 A 20001219

INPADOC legal status

2006-12-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1026622

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-11-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20050630

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: QLT INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHAN, AGNES

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HUNT, DAVID, W., C.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SIMKIN, GUILLERMO, O.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEVY, JULIA, G.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OBOCHI, MODESTUS, O., K.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RICHTER, ANNA, M.

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHAN, AGNES

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HUNT, DAVID, W., C.

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SIMKIN, GUILLERMO, O.

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEVY, JULIA, G.

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OBOCHI, MODESTUS, O., K.

2000-03-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RICHTER, ANNA, M.

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE