Global Patent Index - EP 0981406 A1

EP 0981406 A1 2000-03-01 - IMPROVED CATALYST COMPOSITION USEFUL FOR CONVERSION OF NON-AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS TO AROMATICS AND LIGHT OLEFINS

Title (en)

IMPROVED CATALYST COMPOSITION USEFUL FOR CONVERSION OF NON-AROMATIC HYDROCARBONS TO AROMATICS AND LIGHT OLEFINS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HOCHAKTIVEN KATALYSATORS FÜR DIE SYNTHESE VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN UND KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION CATALYTIQUE AMELIOREE CONVENANT POUR UNE CONVERSION D'HYDROCARBURES NON AROMATIQUES EN AROMATES ET OLEFINES LEGERES

Publication

EP 0981406 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919753 A

Priority

  • US 9807400 W
  • US 85464697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851409A1] A novel zeolite catalyst comprising an acid treated zeolite impregnated with zinc and at least one other metal selected from the group consisting of Group 4B, Group 6B, Group 3A, Group 4A and Group 5A of the periodic table of elements, a method of making such zeolite catalyst, and the use thereof for converting paraffin hydrocarbons to olefins and aromatics with a low rate of coke formation during such conversion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 23/00; B01J 21/00; B01J 23/02; B01J 29/04; B01J 29/06; C07C 4/12; C07C 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 29/40 (2006.01); B01J 29/06 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 4/12 (2006.01); C07C 11/04 (2006.01); C07C 11/06 (2006.01); C07C 15/04 (2006.01); C07C 15/06 (2006.01); C07C 15/08 (2006.01); C10G 35/095 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 35/095 (2013.01); B01J 29/061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851409 A1 19981119; AU 7246898 A 19981208; AU 731283 B2 20010329; BR 9808972 A 20000801; CA 2285209 A1 19981119; CN 1253514 A 20000517; EP 0981406 A1 20000301; EP 0981406 A4 20020227; ID 22823 A 19991209; JP 2001525725 A 20011211; KR 20010012397 A 20010215; NO 995577 A 20000112; NO 995577 D0 19991112

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020111

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DRAKE, CHARLES, ALFRED

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WU, AN-HSIANG

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991119

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL