Global Patent Index - EP 0981412 A1

EP 0981412 A1 2000-03-01 - DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF FOIL EXPANDED METAL

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTINUOUS PRODUCTION OF FOIL EXPANDED METAL

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG VON STRECKMETALL AUS EINER FOLIE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION POUR LA PRODUCTION EN CONTINU DE METAL DEPLOYE A PARTIR D'UNE FEUILLE

Publication

EP 0981412 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925580 A

Priority

  • DE 19720229 A
  • EP 9802774 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19720229A1] The present invention relates to a device for continuous production of foil expanded metal, specially an aluminium foil, comprising a cutting unit for continuous production of parallel, staggered longitudinal cuts in said foil, and an expansion unit for expanding the foil with said cuts perpendicular to the longitudinal direction of said foil and provided with toothed belts which grasp both edges of the foil, in addition to a running body which is arranged therebetween to expand the foil running thereon. In order to increase production speed and quality and to reduce energy consumption, the inventive device is configured in such a way that a toothed belt (12) and a toothed wheel (11) interacting therewith at a given contact angle are assigned to each foil edge, between which the edge of the foil is grasped within an input and an output point (22, 23). The toothed wheels (11) are inclined in relation to each other so that their distance perpendicular to the longitudinal direction of the foil increases at the contact angle in the longitudinal direction of the foil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 31/04 (2006.01); B26F 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/18 (2013.01); B21D 31/04 (2013.01); Y10T 29/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851429A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19720229 A1 19981119; DE 19720229 C2 19990701; AT 232764 T 20030315; CA 2336776 A1 19981119; EP 0981412 A1 20000301; EP 0981412 B1 20030219; ES 2195343 T3 20031201; US 6526637 B1 20030304; WO 9851429 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170601

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2004-01-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807251 P 20030327

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-04-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: SPAETH, MICHAEL

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT