Global Patent Index - EP 0981414 B1

EP 0981414 B1 2002-11-06 - PROCESS AND PLANT FOR MANUFACTURING GRATES

Title (en)

PROCESS AND PLANT FOR MANUFACTURING GRATES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GITTERMATTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION DE MATS EN TREILLIS

Publication

EP 0981414 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99900389 A

Priority

  • AT 9900005 W
  • AT 23598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941029A1] A process and plant are disclosed for manufacturing grates made of longitudinal and transverse hot-rolled steel rods which cross one another and are welded together at their crossing points. The billet used to form the longitudinal rods is continuously withdrawn in a device (1) over a spill from a wire storage, stretched to improve its mechanical technological properties, then tempered and cut into sections. The longitudinal rods are then arranged in groups, according to the arrangement of the longitudinal rods in the grate to be produced, are moved into the working region of the grate welding machine (4) and introduced therein. The billet for forming the transverse rods is continuously withdrawn in a device (5) over a spill from a wire storage, stretched to improve its mechanical technological properties, then conveyed through a buffer storage, tempered, then each transverse rod separated from the billet is fed to the grate welding machine in time with the welding cycles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 9/00 (2006.01); B21F 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 9/007 (2013.01); B21F 9/00 (2013.01); B21F 27/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES GB GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941029 A1 19990819; AT 227179 T 20021115; AT 407719 B 20010525; AT A23598 A 20001015; DE 59903300 D1 20021212; EP 0981414 A1 20000301; EP 0981414 B1 20021106; ES 2143971 T1 20000601; ES 2143971 T3 20030301

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100108

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100108

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060108

2006-01-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060108

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040109

2005-01-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050105

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-01-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040109

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143971 T3

2003-02-27 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030400234

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20030129

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903300 20021212

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB GR IT LI

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227179 T 20021115

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-06-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143971 T1

2000-05-24 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991005

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB GR IT LI