Global Patent Index - EP 0981421 B1

EP 0981421 B1 2000-10-18 - GRINDER FOR GRINDING METAL SLITTING SAW BLADES

Title (en)

GRINDER FOR GRINDING METAL SLITTING SAW BLADES

Title (de)

SCHLEIFSCHEIBE ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON METALLKREISSÄGEBLÄTTERN

Title (fr)

MEULE DE RECTIFICATION POUR LAME SCIE CIRCULAIRE METAUX

Publication

EP 0981421 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98914783 A

Priority

  • DE 9800484 W
  • DE 19719971 A
  • DE 29715683 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6206766B1] The invention relates to a grinding wheel for machining metal circular-saw blades at relatively high rotational speeds, which have machining areas which contain in particular hard materials, such as for example diamond or cubic boron nitride. The grinding wheels according to the invention are intended in particular to improve the centring at relatively high rotational speeds, and consequently to prevent true running problems as far as possible. The base body of the grinding wheel is of contoured design, at least on one side, in the radially outer area of a tool-mounting bore, and at least one centring element can be designed to engage in a formfitting manner in the correspondingly designed contours, so that the grinding wheel and a centring element on a tool spindle of a grinding machine are held together in a force-fitting manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 5/16; B24D 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 29608590 U1 19960711 - AUGUST HEINR SCHMIDT GMBH & CO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6206766 B1 20010327; AT 197008 T 20001115; EP 0981421 A1 20000301; EP 0981421 B1 20001018; ES 2142298 T1 20000416; ES 2142298 T3 20010201; WO 9851447 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-02-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-02-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020425

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020424

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020226

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020225

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020220

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-02-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142298 T3

2001-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-12-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800306 20001123

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197008 T 20001115

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000317

2000-04-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2142298 T1

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990503

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL