Global Patent Index - EP 0981446 A1

EP 0981446 A1 2000-03-01 - SHEET SLANT COMPENSATION IN A PRINTING MACHINE WITH IMAGING DEVICE

Title (en)

SHEET SLANT COMPENSATION IN A PRINTING MACHINE WITH IMAGING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHRÄGLAGEKOMPENSATION FÜR BOGEN IN EINER DRUCKMASCHINE MIT BEBILDERUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

COMPENSATION DE L'INCLINAISON DE FEUILLES DANS UNE MACHINE D'IMPRESSION A UNITE DE FORMATION D'IMAGE

Publication

EP 0981446 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98933538 A

Priority

  • DE 9801350 W
  • DE 19720741 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19720741A1] The invention relates to a printing press with an integrated device to print at least one printing form which is arranged on a printing form cylinder. The invention seeks to provide a printing press with an imaging device and an economical sheet slant compensation facility. According to the invention, this is achieved by feeding the sheet (10) to be printed to the printing cylinder (6) in a slanted position corresponding to the slanted position of the printed image (19) on the printing form (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/12; B41F 7/10; B41F 21/10; B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/10 (2006.01); B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/12 (2013.01); B41F 7/10 (2013.01); B41F 21/00 (2013.01); B41P 2227/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852758A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19720741 A1 19981119; DE 19720741 C2 20010104; EP 0981446 A1 20000301; EP 0981446 B1 20020731; WO 9852758 A1 19981126

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090514

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090514

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805009

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-05

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB