Global Patent Index - EP 0981447 A1

EP 0981447 A1 2000-03-01 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING GUIDE ROLLERS IN A WEB-FED ROTARY PRESS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CLEANING GUIDE ROLLERS IN A WEB-FED ROTARY PRESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN VON LEITWALZEN IN EINER ROLLENROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE NETTOYAGE DE ROULEAUX-GUIDES DANS UNE MACHINE A IMPRIMER ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 0981447 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934752 A

Priority

  • DE 9801383 W
  • DE 19721213 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19721213A1] The invention relates to a method for cleaning guide rollers, according to which a strip of material (1) is provided with retrievable single or multitrack signal information (6, 7). Said information is subsequently used by reading (33) devices to start both a device (19) which applies cleaning agents and a device (28) connected to one of the guide rollers in order to produce a differential speed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/02 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/007 (2013.01); B41F 13/02 (2013.01); B41P 2235/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852760A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19721213 A1 19981210; EP 0981447 A1 20000301; EP 0981447 B1 20011128; JP 2000512935 A 20001003; JP 3270063 B2 20020402; US 6332929 B1 20011225; WO 9852760 A1 19981126

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080521

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080520

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080520

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080531

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080520

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070518

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070703

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070611

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802242 20020110

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE