Global Patent Index - EP 0981450 A1

EP 0981450 A1 2000-03-01 - DEVICE FOR LONGITUDINALLY STITCHING MULTIPIECE PRINTED PRODUCTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR LONGITUDINALLY STITCHING MULTIPIECE PRINTED PRODUCTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM LÄNGSHEFTEN VON MEHRTEILIGEN DRUCKEREIERZEUGNISSEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AGRAFAGE LONGITUDINAL DE PRODUITS IMPRIMES EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES

Publication

EP 0981450 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98907802 A

Priority

  • CH 9800115 W
  • CH 106897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850240A1] The invention relates to a rotating stitcher (4) for driving U-shaped wire stitches (43) into printed products (3) being conveyed along a linear path. The invention also relates to a stapling closing device (5) co-operating with the stitcher (4), for closing the wire stitches (43). The rotating stitcher (4) has stitching heads (7) which are hinged around a rotating support (6). A control device guarantees that the stitching heads (7) are swung into a position where the direction of displacement (E) of the stitch plunger (10) is at right angles to the direction of transport (A) of the products (3) to be stitched. This takes place before or during entry of the stitching head (7) into the stitching area. While the wire stitches are driven in and stitched, the stitching heads (7) are held in this position and thus move linearly in the stitching area. The heads (32) of the stapling closing device (5) are guided in the same way, so that they move linearly during stapling, just like the allocated staple head (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42B 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42B 4/02 (2006.01); B65H 37/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42B 4/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850240A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850240 A1 19981112; AT 226519 T 20021115; AU 6606698 A 19981127; AU 728464 B2 20010111; CA 2284605 A1 19981112; CA 2284605 C 20060711; DE 59806055 D1 20021128; DK 0981450 T3 20021125; EP 0981450 A1 20000301; EP 0981450 B1 20021023; ES 2186129 T3 20030501; JP 2001523178 A 20011120; RU 2185290 C2 20020720; US 6223964 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130323

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130323

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130323

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130323

2013-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 226519 T

- Effective date: 20130323

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130324

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-10-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-10-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120313

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040324

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Free text: FERAG AG#ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- FERAG AG#PATENTABTEILUNG Z. H. MARKUS FELIX ZUERICHSTRASSE 74#8340 HINWIL (CH)

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186129 T3

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030321

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030304

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806055 20021128

2002-11-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-10-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 226519 T 20021115

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990826

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE