Global Patent Index - EP 0981480 B1

EP 0981480 B1 2001-12-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE IN PARTICULAR FOR PACKAGING FLAT OBJECTS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE IN PARTICULAR FOR PACKAGING FLAT OBJECTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG INSBESONDERE ZUM VERPACKEN VON FLACHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINES EN PARTICULIER A L'EMBALLAGE D'OBJETS PLATS

Publication

EP 0981480 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98933504 A

Priority

  • DE 9801310 W
  • DE 29708542 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851570A1] The invention relates to a method and device for handling flat objects, in particular envelopes, coming one by one out of a production machine (3). The objects are collected together and optionally further processed and packaged. The invention is characterized in that, to start with, several flat objects or envelopes (2, 2a) are lifted as a sectional pile (8, 8a) and then deposited somewhere else, and that the sectional piles (8, 8a) are moved in such a way during lifting and/or deposition (transferring) that, after being deposited, the flat objects/envelopes (2, 2a) are lying either on the same side or edge (b) as to start with, or on another side or edge (a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 25/14; B65B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/14 (2006.01); B65B 27/08 (2006.01); B65B 35/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/141 (2013.01); B65B 35/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29708542 U1 19970710; EP 0981480 A1 20000301; EP 0981480 B1 20011205; JP 2002516598 A 20020604; NO 314491 B1 20030331; NO 995493 A 19991110; NO 995493 D0 19991110; NZ 501082 A 20000825; US 6425227 B1 20020730; WO 9851570 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59802348

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120512

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WINKLER + DUENNEBIER GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WINKLER+DUENNEBIER AG, 56564 NEUWIED, DE

- Document: DE 59802348

- Effective date: 20120327

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090512

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090512

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-05-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060513

2005-05-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020205

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802348 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991029

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT SE