Global Patent Index - EP 0981487 A1

EP 0981487 A1 2000-03-01 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GRASPING PART OF AN OUTER LAYER OF A STRIP OF MATERIAL ON A SUPPLY ROLL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GRASPING PART OF AN OUTER LAYER OF A STRIP OF MATERIAL ON A SUPPLY ROLL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN EINES TEILES EINER ÄUSSEREN LAGE EINER MATERIALBAHN VON EINER VORRATSROLLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SAISIR UNE PARTIE D'UNE COUCHE EXTERIEURE D'UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU D'UN ROULEAU D'ALIMENTATION

Publication

EP 0981487 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98933555 A

Priority

  • DE 9801370 W
  • DE 19720492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852857A1] The invention relates to a method for grasping the outer layer of a strip of material (1); whereby reliable detection can be carried out on any given width of the strip of material without further adjustments. According to the invention, this is accomplished by two rotating synchronously driven draw-in members (3, 4) which are placed on the outer layer of the supply roll (2). The outer layer is pulled in-between the draw-in members after contact with the same. Subsequently, the drawn in end is conveyed to an additional processing station (24). The invention also includes a corresponding device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/105 (2013.01); B65H 19/102 (2013.01); Y10S 83/924 (2013.01); Y10T 83/2192 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2196 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852857A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852857 A1 19981126; EP 0981487 A1 20000301; EP 0981487 B1 20010711; ES 2160417 T3 20011101; JP 2000512967 A 20001003; JP 3461842 B2 20031027; US 6264132 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100519

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090519

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090518

2009-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-07-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2160417 T3

2001-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801009 20010816

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-07-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991210

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE