Global Patent Index - EP 0981501 A1

EP 0981501 A1 2000-03-01 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A HOMOGENOUS SHEET OF QUARTZ GLASS WITHOUT STREAKS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A HOMOGENOUS SHEET OF QUARTZ GLASS WITHOUT STREAKS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HOMOGENEN, SCHLIERENFREIEN QUARZGLASPLATTE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE PLAQUE DE VERRE DE QUARTZ HOMOGENE SANS STRIES

Publication

EP 0981501 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928278 A

Priority

  • DE 19720259 A
  • EP 9802887 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851630A1] The invention relates to a simple method for producing a streak-free quartz glass sheet with a highly homogenous degree of refraction. A quartz glass rod (11) is lowered into a melting pot (4) parallel to its longitudinal axis. The cross-section of the melting pot is larger than the cross-section of the quartz glass rod and determines the contour of the quartz glass sheet (19). The quartz glass rod is heated in the melting pot to flow temperature, whereupon it is heated and re-conducted until it melts and the height of the quartz glass flowing in the melting pot reaches the desired quartz-glass sheet width. The melting pot (4) and the quartz glass rod (11) move relatively towards each other in a direction which is perpendicular to the longitudinal axis during the melting process. Preferably, said movement involves a rotational and a translator movement. The quartz glass rod is connected to an arm (14) which is secured to a slide (16) that can be displaced along a guide and that excentrically protrudes into the melting pot (4), wherein the latter is rotationally mounted around an axis which is parallel to the axis of the quartz glass rod and the guide.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C03B 19/02; C03B 20/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 19/02 (2006.01); C03B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C03B 19/02 (2013.01); C03B 20/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851630A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851630 A1 19981119; AT 203980 T 20010815; EP 0981501 A1 20000301; EP 0981501 B1 20010808; JP 2001524920 A 20011204; US 6415630 B1 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040515

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040515

2003-05-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-05-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030514

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020502

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801180 20010913

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL

2001-08-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 203980 T 20010815

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL