Global Patent Index - EP 0981518 A1

EP 0981518 A1 2000-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC NITROGENS, METHODS FOR PRODUCING SAME AND THEIR USE AS PEST CONTROL AGENT

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLIC NITROGENS, METHODS FOR PRODUCING SAME AND THEIR USE AS PEST CONTROL AGENT

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE STICKSTOFF-HETEROCYCLEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

HETEROCYCLES D'AZOTE SUBSTITUES, PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE LES PREPARER ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS DE LUTTE CONTRE LES PARASITES

Publication

EP 0981518 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98921486 A

Priority

  • DE 19719590 A
  • EP 9802432 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719590A1] The invention relates to substituted heterocyclic nitrogens, methods for producing same and their use as pest control agent. In formula (I), A represents CH and D represents N<+>R, A represents nitrogen and D represents N<+>R, or A represents N<+>R and D represents nitrogen, R represents -CR<4>R<5>-E-R<6>, Q<n>- is an inorganic or organic anion, n is 1, 2, 3 or 4 and R<1>-R<6>, E, X, Y and Z have the meanings assigned to them in the description. The invention also relates to a method for producing said heterocyclic nitrogens and their use as pest control agents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 239/42; A01N 43/40; A01N 43/54; C07D 213/74; C07D 405/12; C07D 409/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/40 (2006.01); A01N 43/54 (2006.01); A01N 47/02 (2006.01); A01N 47/06 (2006.01); C07D 213/74 (2006.01); C07D 215/42 (2006.01); C07D 239/42 (2006.01); C07D 239/94 (2006.01); C07D 405/12 (2006.01); C07D 409/12 (2006.01); C09D 7/12 (2006.01); C09D 201/00 (2006.01); C10M 133/40 (2006.01); C10N 30/16 (2006.01); C10N 40/20 (2006.01); C10N 40/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/74 (2013.01); A01N 43/54 (2013.01); A01N 47/02 (2013.01); A01N 47/06 (2013.01); C07D 239/42 (2013.01); C07D 405/12 (2013.01); C07D 409/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851674A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719590 A1 19981112; AU 7431898 A 19981208; EP 0981518 A1 20000301; JP 2001526659 A 20011218; WO 9851674 A1 19981119; ZA 9803840 B 19981109

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011101

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRAUN, RALF

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JAKOBI, HARALD

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHAPER, WOLFGANG

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRAUTSTRUNK, GERHARD

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAERKL, MARTIN

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STARK, HERBERT

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ORT, OSWALD

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANFT, ULRICH

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE GMBH

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRAUN, RALF

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JAKOBI, HARALD

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHAPER, WOLFGANG

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRAUTSTRUNK, GERHARD

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAERKL, MARTIN

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STARK, HERBERT

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ORT, OSWALD

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANFT, ULRICH

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT