Global patent index - EP 0981538 A1

EP 0981538 A1 2000-03-01 - PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS OF 5ALPHA-PREGNAN-3BETA, 16ALP HA-DIOL-20-ONE 3-SULFATE USEFUL AS PROGESTINS AND CNS DISORDERS

Title (en)

PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS OF 5ALPHA-PREGNAN-3BETA, 16ALP HA-DIOL-20-ONE 3-SULFATE USEFUL AS PROGESTINS AND CNS DISORDERS

Title (de)

PHARMAZEUTISCHE ANWENDBARE SÄLZE VON 5.ALPHA.-PREGNAN-3.BETA.,16.ALPHA.-DIOL-20-ON 3-SULPHAT ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ZNS KRANKHEITEN UND ZUR GESTAGENTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES DE 5ALPHA-PREGNAN-3BETA, 16ALPHA-DIOL-20-ONE 3-SULFATE UTILISES COMME PROGESTATIFS ET DANS LES TROUBLES DU SNC

Publication

EP 0981538 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918787 A

Priority

  • US 9808454 W
  • US 85057197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850411A1] The invention provides a pharmaceutically acceptable salt of 5 alpha -pregnan-3 beta , 16 alpha -diol-20-one 3-sulfate ester, which is useful as a progestational agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07J 31/00; A61K 31/57

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/57 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07J 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07J 31/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850411A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850411 A1 19981112; AR 012637 A1 20001108; AU 7164598 A 19981127; AU 746326 B2 20020418; BR 9809435 A 20000613; CA 2289096 A1 19981112; CN 1254342 A 20000524; EP 0981538 A1 20000301; JP 2001527552 A 20011225; KR 20010012180 A 20010215; ZA 9803706 B 19991101

INPADOC legal status

2006-12-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1025578

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-06-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19991025;LT PAYMENT 19991025;LV PAYMENT 19991025;RO PAYMENT 19991025;SI PAYMENT 19991025