Global Patent Index - EP 0981592 A1

EP 0981592 A1 2000-03-01 - IMPROVED OIL COMPOSITION

Title (en)

IMPROVED OIL COMPOSITION

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE ÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE PETROLE AMELIOREE

Publication

EP 0981592 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925600 A

Priority

  • EP 9802833 W
  • GB 9709826 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851763A1] An improved fuel oil composition comprises fuel oil and specific acylated polyalkylene polyamine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/22; C10L 10/00; C10L 10/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/2383 (2006.01); C10L 10/00 (2006.01); C10L 10/04 (2006.01); C10L 10/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 10/08 (2013.01); C10L 1/2383 (2013.01); C10L 10/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851763A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851763 A1 19981119; AU 7765498 A 19981208; CA 2289460 A1 19981119; CA 2289460 C 20061107; DE 69825885 D1 20040930; DE 69825885 T2 20050908; EP 0981592 A1 20000301; EP 0981592 B1 20040825; GB 9709826 D0 19970709; JP 2001525005 A 20011204; JP 4536831 B2 20100901

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100401

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-11 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070220

2010-08-11 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100319

2010-08-11 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20100319

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090507

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090516

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: INNOSPEC LIMITED

2006-08-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: INNOSPEC LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-10-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE ASSOCIATED OCTEL COMPANY LIMITED OF

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: THE ASSOCIATED OCTEL COMPANY LIMITED OF

2005-07-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THE ASSOCIATED OCTEL COMPANY LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-07-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THE ASSOCIATED OCTEL COMPANY LIMITED

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-04-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69825885 P 20040930

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-08-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021220

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991115

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL