Global Patent Index - EP 0981593 A1

EP 0981593 A1 2000-03-01 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OBTAINING STEARIN FROM ANIMAL OR VEGETABLE FATS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OBTAINING STEARIN FROM ANIMAL OR VEGETABLE FATS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEWINNUNG VON STEARIN AUS FETTEN TIERISCHER ODER PFLANZLICHER HERKUNFT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PREPARER DE LA STEARINE A PARTIR DE GRAISSES D'ORIGINE ANIMALE OU VEGETALE

Publication

EP 0981593 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98917043 A

Priority

  • DE 19719776 A
  • EP 9801663 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719776C1] The invention relates to a method and device for obtaining stearin from animal or vegetable fats. The invention aims to provide a method according to which the separation efficiency between the oil and the stearin phase can be kept constant for the duration of a production period so as to achieve optimal stearin quality and yield. According to said method, crystallized oil having a temperature of between 10 DEG C and 40 DEG C is introduced into the inlet (12) of a non-selfunloading nozzle centrifuge (11) fitted with a stack of plates (15) and an immobile grasping element (16) for the oil phase. The solid phase is guided through flow spaces which narrow towards the nozzles (20) and discharged through said nozzles. To achieve a high separation efficiency between the stearin phase and the oil phase the ratio of flow input to nozzle output is set at between 2:1 and 4:1. Said method is used for obtaining stearin from animal or vegetable fats.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11B 7/00; B01D 21/26; B04B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/12 (2006.01); C11B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11B 7/0075 (2013.01); B04B 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851764A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DK GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719776 C1 19981203; AR 010156 A1 20000517; AU 7039698 A 19981208; AU 728509 B2 20010111; BR 9804898 A 19990908; CO 5050406 A1 20010627; DK 0981593 T3 20020429; EP 0981593 A1 20000301; EP 0981593 B1 20020116; MY 118310 A 20040930; NZ 333603 A 20000327; US 6169191 B1 20010102; WO 9851764 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-04-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DK GB IT SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010806

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981118

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DK GB IT SE