Global patent index - EP 0981611 A1

EP 0981611 A1 2000-03-01 - POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING PROEXENDIN, AND METHODS AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

POLYNUCLEOTIDES ENCODING PROEXENDIN, AND METHODS AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

Für ProeXENDIN KODIERENDE POLYNUKLEOTIDE, Verfahren UND ANWENDUNGEN derselben

Title (fr)

POLYNUCLEOTIDES CODANT LA PROEXENDINE, ET PROCEDES ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 0981611 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98901908 A

Priority

  • CA 9800071 W
  • GB 9702582 A
  • US 3741297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835033A1] Exendin 4 is a biologically active peptide first isolated from Gila monster venom. The invention encompasses polynucleotides encoding proexendin peptides, including exendin and novel peptides, as well as isolated or recombinant proexendin peptides. The invention also includes antibodies which specifically recognize such peptides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; C07K 14/575; C07K 16/18; C12N 15/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07K 14/575 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/57563 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835033A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835033 A1 19980813; AU 5850798 A 19980826; CA 2279836 A1 19980813; EP 0981611 A1 20000301; JP 2001512307 A 20010821

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040428

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMYLIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-04 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2002-04-24 [18RA] DATE OF RECEIPT OF REQUEST FOR RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18RA

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-03-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011030

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990818

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE