Global patent index - EP 0981634 A1

EP 0981634 A1 2000-03-01 - PRODUCTION OF SELF-COMPATIBLE $i(BRASSICA) HYBRIDS USING A SELF-INCOMPATIBLE POLLINATION CONTROL SYSTEM

Title (en)

PRODUCTION OF SELF-COMPATIBLE $i(BRASSICA) HYBRIDS USING A SELF-INCOMPATIBLE POLLINATION CONTROL SYSTEM

Title (de)

HERSTELLUNG VON SELBSTKOMPATIBLEN BRASSICA-HYBRIDEN MITTELS EINEM SELBSTINCOMPATIBILITÄTS-BESTÄUBUNGSKONTROLLESYSTEM

Title (fr)

PRODUCTION DE $i(BRASSICA) HYBRIDES AUTO-COMPATIBLES AU MOYEN D'UN SYSTEME DE REGULATION DE LA POLLINISATION AUTO-INCOMPATIBLE

Publication

EP 0981634 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98902888 A

Priority

  • CA 9800089 W
  • US 3771997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835052A1] This invention relates to cells of a self-compatible hybrid plant, the parents of which are a homozygous self-incompatible female parent, and a homozygous male parent, and the nuclear genome of which contains a vector comprising a DNA sequence which, when expressed in a plant cell, imparts self-incompatibility to the plant, and a promoter capable of directing the expression of the DNA sequence in the cell. The invention includes the vector, a plant comprising the cells, a plant transformed with the vector, the seed of such plants, and a method for conferring the self-compatible phenotype on progeny of the self-incompatible female parent and self-compatible male parent. The invention comprises an improved self-pollination control system for hybrid seed production or breeding which, by using a knockout transgene to eliminate the self-incompatibility phenotype in hybrids, can result in increased yields.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/82; A01H 5/00; C12N 15/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/415 (2006.01); C12N 15/29 (2006.01); C12N 15/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8287 (2013.01); C07K 14/415 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835052A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835052 A1 19980813; AU 5977098 A 19980826; AU 736220 B2 20010726; CA 2279496 A1 19980813; EP 0981634 A1 20000301; PL 335072 A1 20000410

INPADOC legal status

2002-06-12 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18W

- Effective date: 20020415

2001-03-14 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18W

2001-03-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010110

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROTHSTEIN, STEVEN, J.

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STAHL, RICHARD, J.

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GORING, DAPHNE, R.

2000-07-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PRODUCTION OF SELF-COMPATIBLE BRASSICA HYBRIDS USING A SELF-INCOMPATIBLE POLLINATION CONTROL SYSTEM

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990907

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE