Global patent index - EP 0981673 A1

EP 0981673 A1 2000-03-01 - DEVICE FOR STABILISING AN UNSTABLE SHOULDER IN RAILWAY AND ROAD CONSTRUCTION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR STABILISING AN UNSTABLE SHOULDER IN RAILWAY AND ROAD CONSTRUCTION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR SICHERUNG INSTABILER BANKETTE IM BAHNBAU UND IM STRASSEN- UND WEGEBAU, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER ERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR STABILISER UNE BANQUETTE INSTABLE DANS LE DOMAINE DE LA CONSTRUCTION DE VOIES FERREES ET DE ROUTES, ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 0981673 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98914762 A

Priority

  • CH 9800164 W
  • CH 110997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851869A1] The inventive device is provided with angular support grids (2), said support grids being placed next to each other on the ground. The front faces of said support grids are covered with a geocompatible manufactured material (7), filled with bulk material (8) and fixed in the ground by means of vertical sustaining elements (3). Said sustaining elements (3) are driven into the ground at a set distance from the front faces (21) of the support grids (2), through the base parts of said support grids (2), by means of pile-driving and/or boring and optionally, are fixed by oblique tension elements (4) which are driven into the ground at an angle. It is possible to fix several support grids (2) arranged on top of each other with the same sustaining elements (3) or tension elements (4). Once a formation has been created, sustaining elements are driven into the ground until only the shanks are left protruding. The support grids are then placed on said shanks. Alternatively, support grids are placed on the formation and sustaining elements are then driven through the base parts of said support grids, into the ground until only the shanks are left protruding. The front faces of the support grids are covered with a geocompatible manufactured material and filled with bulk material (8). The tension elements which correspond to the sustaining elements can be driven into the ground at an angle and fixed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/02 (2006.01); E01B 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/0233 (2013.01); E01B 2/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851869 A1 19981119; AT 222311 T 20020815; AU 6916298 A 19981208; CH 692390 A5 20020531; DE 59805193 D1 20020919; EP 0981673 A1 20000301; EP 0981673 B1 20020814; EP 0981673 B2 20060222

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080424

2009-07-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080424

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-01 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2006-07-12 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

- Effective date: 20060621

2006-03-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RUEEGGER SYSTEME AG INGENIEURLOESUNGEN IN DER GEO

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-02-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20060222

2006-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

2006-02-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RUEEGGER SYSTEME AG INGENIEURLOESUNGEN IN DER GEOT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-02-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GLEISAG GLEIS- UND TIEFBAU AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-11-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RUEEGGER SYSTEME AGINGENIEURLOESUNGEN IN DER GEOTE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-11-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GLEISAG GLEIS- UND TIEFBAU AG RORSCHACH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-07-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRANCE GABION

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-02-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-11-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805193

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 222311

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011206

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE