Global Patent Index - EP 0981674 A1

EP 0981674 A1 2000-03-01 - MANHOLE COVER

Title (en)

MANHOLE COVER

Title (de)

SCHACHTABDECKUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COUVERTURE DE PUITS

Publication

EP 0981674 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928253 A

Priority

  • DE 29708650 U
  • EP 9802804 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CZ297447B6] The present invention relates to a manhole cover (2) intended particularly for use with sewer manholes or such like installed in road surfaces (8). Said cover (2) comprises at least one concrete ring which after installation receives a cover element (5) on an upper supporting rim (6) situated above a through opening (3) surrounded by said supporting rim (6), and which surrounds an upper area (7) of the manhole shaft element (4). The concrete ring is embodied as a formed body (1), which below the supporting rim (6) has an enlarged through opening (3) in which the manhole shaft element (4) is housed. The formed body (1) is provided in an inner region of a profiled projecting part (9) with a tubular section (13, 13', 113, 113') defining on one side said through opening (3), which, on the other side and in the direction toward a support contour (10) forms a ring-shaped joint (12) in which said manhole shaft element (4) engages by a plug-in connection on at least a portion thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 29/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851870A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29708650 U1 19980917; AT 223539 T 20020915; AU 8016798 A 19981208; CZ 297447 B6 20061213; CZ 9904037 A3 20010314; EP 0981674 A1 20000301; EP 0981674 B1 20020904; ES 2182326 T3 20030301; HU 0002933 A2 20001228; HU 0002933 A3 20020128; HU 222068 B1 20030428; PL 189867 B1 20050930; PL 337005 A1 20000731; WO 9851870 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160513

2017-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2017-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 223539 T

- Effective date: 20160513

2017-01-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160425

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150531

2015-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140514

2015-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150626

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140513

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140513

2015-02-27 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20150106

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140514

2015-01-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140513

2015-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140513

2014-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140825

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130518

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130529

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130418

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120528

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KORTMANN, KARL

- Free text: KORTMANN, KARL#AM WERKSHORN 21#48465 SCHUETTORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KORTMANN, KARL#AM WERKSHORN 21#48465 SCHUETTORF (DE)

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182326 T3

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021029

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805421 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19991130

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223539 T 20020915

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011004

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991130

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19991130