Global Patent Index - EP 0981716 A2

EP 0981716 A2 2000-03-01 - FIREARM EQUIPPED WITH A QUICK SAFETY DEVICE AND SAFETY DEVICE KIT

Title (en)

FIREARM EQUIPPED WITH A QUICK SAFETY DEVICE AND SAFETY DEVICE KIT

Title (de)

FEUERWAFFE MIT SCHNELLWIRKENDER SICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BAUSATZ FÜR EINE SOLCHE SICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

ARME A FEU MUNIE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE RAPIDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE EN KIT

Publication

EP 0981716 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 98920412 A

Priority

  • BE 9800069 W
  • BE 9700427 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9851984A2] The invention concerns a single action semiautomatic firearm provided with a firing system by an inserted cock (11) such as a pistol or optionally a revolver which, by means of a trigger actuated by the release spring, distributes the cartridge either in the slide in the case of a pistol or in the cylinder in the case of a revolver. The invention is characterised in that said firearm has means for blocking (17, 18) the cock when the latter is arranged in a forward position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/74; F41A 17/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/38 (2006.01); F41A 17/74 (2006.01); F41A 19/15 (2006.01); F41A 19/45 (2006.01); F41A 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/45 (2013.01); F41A 17/38 (2013.01); F41A 17/74 (2013.01); F41A 19/15 (2013.01); F41A 35/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9851984A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9851984 A2 19981119; WO 9851984 A3 19990701; AU 7327498 A 19981208; BE 1011156 A4 19990504; BR 9809821 A 20000627; CA 2288955 A1 19981119; DE 69818251 D1 20031023; DE 69818251 T2 20040715; EP 0981716 A2 20000301; EP 0981716 B1 20030917; ES 2206925 T3 20040516; TR 9902784 T2 20000221

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070516

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070516

2006-05-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050514

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2206925 T3

2004-05-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031211

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69818251 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT