Global patent index - EP 0981766 A1

EP 0981766 A1 2000-03-01 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR READING AND PROCESSING A RADIATION IMAGE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR READING AND PROCESSING A RADIATION IMAGE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM AUSLESEN UND VERARBEITEN EINES STRAHLUNGSBILDES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DISPOSITIF POUR LA LECTURE ET LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE IMAGE RADIOLOGIQUE

Publication

EP 0981766 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925555 A

Priority

  • DE 19719954 A
  • EP 9802695 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19719954A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for reading and processing radiation images individually recorded on an erasable image carrier (34), specially an image plate coated with a crystalline storage substance. In order to read a radiation image, the image storage surface (36) of an image carrier (34) which is fixed on a reading device (10) is scanned by means of a scanning beam (40) of an excitation light source (22). The useful light (44) detected during scanning of the image points (42) of the image storage surface (36) is scanned for scan coordinates ( phi , z) of the reading device (10) and digitally converted into an image matrix reproducing the radiation image in a grid-like manner. In order to correct errors in the read-out radiation image due to inhomogeneities of the image storage surface (36), a corrected value is determined as an element of a corrected matrix from an initial correcting image for each image point (42). The image matrix is then corrected point by point according to the corrected matrix on the radiation images which have been recorded and are read on the image carrier (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01T 1/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01T 1/00 (2006.01); G06T 3/00 (2006.01); H01J 31/62 (2006.01); H04N 1/04 (2006.01); H04N 1/409 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 31/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852070A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19719954 A1 19981119; EP 0981766 A1 20000301; EP 0981766 B1 20040714; JP 2002501701 A 20020115; WO 9852070 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-07-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-01-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811675

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-08-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-07-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040714

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030429

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991006

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT