Global Patent Index - EP 0981787 A1

EP 0981787 A1 2000-03-01 - EXCHANGE RATE TABLE

Title (en)

EXCHANGE RATE TABLE

Title (de)

WECHSELTABELLE

Title (fr)

TABLE DE CHANGE

Publication

EP 0981787 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99908999 A

Priority

  • FR 9900528 W
  • FR 9802916 A
  • FR 9808876 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776082A1] the table uses dual images to show two currency values in same positions.- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - The exchange rate table comprises a small rectangular table which is subdivided into a rectangular grid. Each cell on the grid contains a pair of numbers indicating a quantity of a first currency. The cells are numbered in a sequential pattern. The number pairs are only visible when the grid is seen from a first tilt angle. When the grid is seen from a second, different tilt angle the equivalent values in a different currency are seen. It is possible to offer a third viewing angle, which can allow either a third currency to be seen, or a conversion into the second currency at a different rate of exchange

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06C 1/00; G06G 1/00; G09F 19/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06C 1/00 (2006.01); G06G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06G 1/0073 (2013.01); G06C 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • "EXEMPLES DE CONVERTISSEURS", COLLECTIONNEURS, XX, XX, 1 January 1971 (1971-01-01), XX, pages COMPLETE, XP002932335
  • "Catalog: THE XOGRAPH line by OPTIGRAPHICS, 1976,", ANNOUNCEMENT OPTIGRAPHICS, XX, XX, 1 February 1976 (1976-02-01), XX, pages 3 - 15, XP002968677
  • See also references of WO 9946656A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776082 A1 19990917; FR 2776082 B3 20000804; EP 0981787 A1 20000301; WO 9946656 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-26 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029187

2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030807

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL PT SE