Global Patent Index - EP 0981799 A1

EP 0981799 A1 2000-03-01 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING, OUTSIDE A NETWORK, DATA USABLE ON THE NETWORK

Title (en)

METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING, OUTSIDE A NETWORK, DATA USABLE ON THE NETWORK

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UBERTRAGUNG VON INFORMATIONEN AUSSERHALB EINE KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZES,DIE FUR DIESES GENUTZT WERDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION, EN DEHORS D'UN RESEAU, DE DONNEES UTILISABLES SUR LE RESEAU

Publication

EP 0981799 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98925717 A

Priority

  • FR 9800968 W
  • FR 9705975 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2763409A1] The system comprises two computers and two data media. Each data medium (1) can receive data from the computer or from the other medium, and transmit data to a computer or to the other data medium, the transmission being carried out by infrared radiation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/00 (2006.01); G06F 3/00 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852140A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763409 A1 19981120; CA 2289597 A1 19981119; EP 0981799 A1 20000301; JP 2001525955 A 20011211; WO 9852140 A1 19981119

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029419

2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-03-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING, OUTSIDE A NETWORK, ADDRESSES USABLE ON THE NETWORK

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-08-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991210

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL