Global Patent Index - EP 0981821 A1

EP 0981821 A1 2000-03-01 - CABLE WITH IMPACT-RESISTANT COATING

Title (en)

CABLE WITH IMPACT-RESISTANT COATING

Title (de)

KABEL MIT SCHLAGFESTEM SCHICHT

Title (fr)

CABLE AVEC REVETEMENT RESISTANT AUX IMPACTS

Publication

EP 0981821 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928233 A

Priority

  • EP 98928233 A
  • EP 9802698 W
  • EP 97107969 A
  • US 4712797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852197A1] The present invention relates to a coating for cables which is capable of protecting the cable against accidental impacts. By inserting into the structure of a power transmissioncable a suitable coating of expanded polymer material of adequate thickness, preferably in contact with the sheath of outer polymer coating, it is possible to obtain a cable which has a high impact strength. The Applicant has moreover observed that an expanded polymer material used as a coating for cables makes it possible to obtain a higher impact strength for this cable than using a similar coating based on the same polymer which is not expanded. A cable with a coating of this type has various advantages over a conventional cable with metal armor, such as, for example, easier processing, a reduction in the weight and dimensions of the finished cable and a lower environmental impact as regards recycling of the cable once its working cycle is over.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/00; H01B 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/02 (2006.01); H01B 7/00 (2006.01); H01B 7/17 (2006.01); H01B 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/185 (2013.01); H01B 7/189 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852197A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852197 A1 19981119; AP 1121 A 20021129; AP 9901665 D0 19991231; AR 015677 A1 20010516; AT 220240 T 20020715; AU 743873 B2 20020207; AU 8015898 A 19981208; BR 9809119 A 20000801; BR 9809119 B1 20111018; CA 2289748 A1 19981119; CA 2289748 C 20030722; CN 1255229 A 20000531; CN 1308964 C 20070404; CZ 293006 B6 20040114; CZ 9903989 A3 20000614; DE 69806377 T2 20030123; DE 69806377 T3 20090723; DK 0981821 T3 20021021; DZ 2490 A1 20030125; EA 001727 B1 20010827; EA 199901035 A1 20000828; EE 04446 B1 20050215; EE 9900489 A 20000615; EG 21959 A 20020430; EP 0981821 A1 20000301; EP 0981821 B1 20020703; EP 0981821 B2 20081231; ES 2178223 T3 20021216; ES 2178223 T5 20090518; GE P20022663 B 20011112; HU 0002747 A2 20001228; HU 0002747 A3 20010129; HU 223994 B1 20050428; ID 24381 A 20000713; IL 132408 A 20031210; IL 132408 D0 20010319; JP 2002510424 A 20020402; MA 24545 A1 19981231; MY 117958 A 20040830; NO 327795 B1 20090928; NO 995535 A 19991112; NO 995535 D0 19991112; NZ 337909 A 20011026; OA 11303 A 20030825; PL 187115 B1 20040531; PL 336696 A1 20000703; PT 981821 E 20021129; SI 981821 T1 20021031; SK 152099 A3 20000814; SK 286369 B6 20080805; TN SN98064 A1 20000613; TR 9902729 T2 20000321; TW 405126 B 20000911; YU 58199 A 20010528; ZA 9804027 B 19990119

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-04 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20090400906

- Effective date: 20151208

2016-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151109

2016-01-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151208

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150508

2015-11-17 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20151109

2014-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140529

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090509

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020703

2009-06-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2009-05-18 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2009-04-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20090400906

2009-03-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-02-28 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MANTENIMENTO DEL BREVETTO IN FORMA MODIFICATA

2008-12-31 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-12-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT MK RO SI

2008-11-03 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PRYSMIAN CAVI E SISTEMI ENERGIA SRL, IT

- Effective date: 20081027

2008-11-03 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Owner name: PRYSMIAN (LUX) II SARL, LU

- Effective date: 20081021

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-14 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GSCP ATHENA (LUX) II SARL, LU

- Effective date: 20081003

2008-10-07 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PIRELLI & C. S.P.A., IT

- Effective date: 20080925

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080528

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070508

2008-02-20 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2008-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PIRELLI & C. S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20071113

2008-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PRYSMIAN CAVI E SISTEMI ENERGIA S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20071113

2007-12-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PRYSMIAN CAVI E SISTEMI ENERGIA S.R.L.

- Free text: PIRELLI S.P.A.#VIALE SARCA, 222#20126 MILANO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- PRYSMIAN CAVI E SISTEMI ENERGIA S.R.L.#VIALE SARCA 222#20126 MILANO (IT)

2007-09-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-05-26 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PRYSMIAN CAVI E SISTEMI ENERGIA S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20060308

2006-03-08 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PRYSMIAN CAVI E SISTEMI ENERGIA S.R.L.

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-02-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: PIRELLI & C. S.P.A.

2003-12-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIRELLI & C. S.P.A.

2003-12-05 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2003-08-29 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: PIRELLI S.P.A. IT

- Effective date: 20030527

2003-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PIRELLI S.P.A.

- Free text: PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI S.P.A.#VIALE SARCA, 222#20126 MILANO (IT) -TRANSFER TO- PIRELLI S.P.A.#VIALE SARCA, 222#20126 MILANO (IT)

2003-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NEXANS

2003-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PIRELLI S.P.A.

2003-06-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NEXANS

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-05-08 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-05-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-03-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIRELLI S.P.A.

2002-12-30 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178223 T3

2002-12-02 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403255

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2002-10-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806377 20020808

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991116;LT PAYMENT 19991116;MK PAYMENT 19991116;RO PAYMENT 19991116;SI PAYMENT 19991116

2002-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220240 T 20020715

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991116

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991116;LT PAYMENT 19991116;MK PAYMENT 19991116;RO PAYMENT 19991116;SI PAYMENT 19991116